EP1174081 - Method and system having simplified neuromuscular transmission scoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Marquette Medical Systems, Inc. 8200 West Tower Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | [2008/04] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states GE Marquette Medical Systems, Inc. 8200 West Tower Avenue Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duckert, David Wayne W148 N8094 University Drive Menomonee Falls, Wisconsin 53051 / US | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/04] | Goode, Ian Roy GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306170.0 | 18.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | US20000628989 | 21.07.2000 Original published format: US 628989 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1174081 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1174081 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174081 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0488, A61B5/11 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/1106 (EP,US);
A61B2505/05 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FI, FR, GB, LI, NL [2004/41] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System für vereinfachte neuromuskuläre Transmissionsmessung | [2002/04] | English: | Method and system having simplified neuromuscular transmission scoring | [2002/04] | French: | Méthode et système de numération simplifiée de transmission neuromusculaire | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | LI | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | GB | 18.07.2008 | [2009/29] |
Former [2008/48] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
LI | 23.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | Examination | US4291705 | US5810747 | US5131401 | US4387723 | US5391081 |