EP1176795 - Information processing apparatus issuing job to peripheral device and method for issuing job to peripheral device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeo, Akinori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Takashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takagi, Tomoko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co., 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306340.9 | 24.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000224474 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000224474 | JP20000340195 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000340195 | JP20010223068 | 24.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001223068 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176795 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176795 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
H04N1/00238 (EP,US);
H04N1/00236 (EP,US);
H04N1/00241 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/08] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung bzw. Verfahren zur Ausgabe von einem Job an einem peripherischen Gerät | [2002/05] | English: | Information processing apparatus issuing job to peripheral device and method for issuing job to peripheral device | [2002/05] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'information tant que procédé pour délivrer une tâche à un appareil périphérique | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 12.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/47] | 12.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2015 | 12.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0651296 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [X]US5799139 (YAMAMOTO HARUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,11,19,28,29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5828465 (MURAMATSU HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-49* the whole document *; | [A]EP0998118 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [A]US6061150 (YAMAMOTO MASAHITO [JP]) [A] 1-49 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5799139 | EP0998118 |