EP1176522 - Information distribution service system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noss Corporation 6-10 Shiba 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoi, Hideaki 14-10-105 Ooyata 2-chome Adachi-ku. Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sando, Masayuki 30-8 Meziro 5-chome Toshima-ku. Tokyo / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306344.1 | 24.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000223953 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000223953 | JP20010193019 | 26.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001193019 | JP20010204261 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001204261 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176522 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176522 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/60 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
G06Q50/00 (KR);
H04L67/561 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04L67/2895 (EP,US);
H04L67/564 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System für einen Dienst zur Ausbreitung von Informationen | [2002/05] | English: | Information distribution service system | [2002/05] | French: | Système de service de distribution d'informations | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 02.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9716796 (HERZ FREDERICK S M [US], et al) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]US5754938 (HERZ FREDERICK S M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * figures 10-16 *; | [X]US5754939 (HERZ FREDERICK S M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US5758257 (HERZ FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]EP0944002 (SONY EUROP GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19913509 (MITEL CORP [CA]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US6044376 (KURTZMAN II STEPHEN J [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * |