EP1175987 - Film formation method capable of preventing fluctuation of ribbon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Hidekazu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Toshikazu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Katai, Yukihiro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Stevens, Jason Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306349.0 | 24.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000223250 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000223250 | JP20010071541 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001071541 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175987 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175987 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175987 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/26, B29C47/88 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
B29C41/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | B29C41/26 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/03] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Folie ohne Schwankungen | [2002/05] | English: | Film formation method capable of preventing fluctuation of ribbon | [2002/05] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un film capable d'empêcher les fluctuations du film | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 24.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1002450 (CROWN ZELLERBACH CORP) [A] 1-26 * page 1, line 65 - line 68 * * page 2, line 127 - page 3, line 10; figure 3 *; | [X]JPH11198285 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11198285 A 19990727 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 27-31 * abstract * |