EP1176814 - Photoelectric conversion device, radiation detection apparatus, image processing system, and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endo, Tadao, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
Endo, Tadao, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/24] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co., 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306400.1 | 26.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000229696 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000229696 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176814 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176814 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176814 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/32, H04N5/361 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
G01T1/2928 (EP,US);
H04N25/63 (EP,US);
H04N5/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | H04N5/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/06] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Photoelektrisches Umwandlungsgerät, Strahlungsdetektoreinrichtung, Bildverarbeitungssystem und Steuerverfahren | [2012/03] | English: | Photoelectric conversion device, radiation detection apparatus, image processing system, and driving method thereof | [2002/05] | French: | Dispositif de conversion photoélectrique, appareil détecteur de radiation, système de traitement d'images, et procédé de commande | [2002/05] |
Former [2002/05] | Photoelektrisches Umwandlungsgerät, Strahlungsdetektoreinrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Steuerverfahren | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 01.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.06.2012 | FR | 13.08.2012 | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/15] | NL | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4810881 (BERGER JEAN L [FR], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 61 - line 68 * * column 9, line 41 - column 12, line 32 * * figures 9a-9h,10-13 *; | [X]WO9801992 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 34 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5777335 (MOCHIZUKI CHIORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 32 - line 35 ** figure 1 *; | [X]DE19743523 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0245147 | EP0792062 | - CHABBAL J ET AL, "Amorphous silicon X-ray image sensor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE, USA, (19960211), vol. 2708, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 499 - 510, XP002487371 | by applicant | US4810881 | EP0792062 | WO9801992 |