EP1178393 - A method and apparatus for automatic updating of printer configuration and status data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sabbagh, Raymond J. 23709 Hynford Place Harbor City, CA 90710 / US | 02 /
Onaga, May G. 4963 Corisca Drive Cypress, California 90630 / US | 03 /
Guo, Likang 129 Keyel Drive Rochester, New York 14625 / US | 04 /
Bodden, Evral E. 14511 Cordary Avenue Hawthorne, California 90250 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306496.9 | 30.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | US20000631869 | 02.08.2000 Original published format: US 631869 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178393 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178393 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/1229 (EP,US);
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1232 (EP,US);
G06F3/1288 (EP,US);
G06F9/4411 (EP,US);
G06F3/1205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/44] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren und Gerät, um automatisch die Konfiguration und Zustandsdaten eines Druckers zu aktualisieren | [2002/06] | English: | A method and apparatus for automatic updating of printer configuration and status data | [2002/06] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de mise à jour automatique de configuration d'imprimante et des données d'état | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 05.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/40] | 03.05.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0952513 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 11,12 * figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 26 - line 55 *; | [X]US5580177 (GASE STEPHEN T [US], et al) [X] 4-6,8,9 * figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 37 * * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 14 * | by applicant | US5580177 | EP0952513 |