EP1178236 - Friction member and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states NISSHINBO INDUSTRIES, INC. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho, 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamane, Takeshi, c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc. 1503 Akahori, Oura-machi Oura-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306500.8 | 30.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000232603 | 01.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000232603 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178236 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178236 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02, F16D69/04 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
B29C43/006 (EP,US);
F16D69/00 (KR);
F16D69/02 (EP,US);
F16D69/026 (EP,US);
F16D69/04 (EP,US);
B29L2031/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/06] | F16D69/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/34] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Reibbelagelement, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2002/06] | English: | Friction member and method of manufacture | [2002/06] | French: | Elément de friction et méthode pour sa fabrication | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5516587 (TANAKA TADASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6,8 * column 1, line 40 - line 55 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 15 *; | [Y]JPS58160638 ; | [Y]JPH05346129 ; | [Y]JPH07293615 ; | [A]US5236528 (NAKAGAWA MITSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 44, Database accession no. 1983-795412, XP002256363 & JPS58160638 A 19830924 (ALLIED CORP) [Y] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 05, Database accession no. 1994-040220, XP002256364 & JPH05346129 A 19931227 (NISSHINBO IND INC) [Y] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 08, Database accession no. 1996-071792, XP002256365 & JPH07293615 A 19951107 (AISHIN KAKO KK) [Y] 1,6,8 * abstract * |