EP1177912 - Method of creating a printed medium with a protective undercoat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kwasny, David M. 29615 NE Weslinn Drive Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | 02 /
Kowalski, Mark H. 19 Mark Vincent Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | 03 /
Kasperchik, Vladek P. 4308 NW Jon Place Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306540.4 | 31.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | US20000630318 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: US 630318 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177912 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177912 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177912 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1705 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines mit einer Schutzunterbeschichtung bedruckten Mediums | [2002/06] | English: | Method of creating a printed medium with a protective undercoat | [2002/06] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un matériau imprimé ayant une sous-couche de protection | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.10.2006 | 10.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9530547 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-47 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 28; claims 1,20,21 * * page 18, line 15 - line 25 *; | [X]US5798161 (KITA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-47 * column 20, line 51 - line 65 * * column 23, line 8 - line 45 *; | [X]JPS60189486 ; | [X]US5441838 (PANE SHARON G [US]) [X] 1-47 * column 7, line 17 - line 32; figure 4; claims 13,19 * * column 8, line 17 - line 65 *; | [X]JPH10297126 ; | [DX]US5555011 (TANG MANH [US], et al) [DX] 1-47 * column 4, line 30 - line 45; figures 2,5,6; claims 1,7 *; | [X]JPH11240265 ; | [E]EP1122088 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [E] 1-47 * paragraphs [0039] , [0042]; claims 1-9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860214), vol. 010, no. 037, Database accession no. (M - 453), & JP60189486 A 19850926 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-47 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 04, Database accession no. 1999-039784, XP002245977 & JPH10297126 A 19981110 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-47 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11240265 A 19990907 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-47 * abstract * |