EP1178267 - Air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arita, Kazuhei, Yazaki Corporation 1370 Kayasu-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Matsukiyo, Tomiyuki, Yazaki Corporation 1370 Kayasu-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Ichino, Yoshihiro, Yazaki Corporation 1370 Kayasu-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Tongu, Shinji, Yazaki Corporation 1370 Kayasu-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306585.9 | 31.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000231692 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000231692 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1178267 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178267 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25B27/02, F24F3/06, F24D3/18 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
F24F5/00 (EP,KR,US);
F24F3/06 (EP,US);
F25B27/02 (EP,US);
F25B29/006 (EP,US);
Y02A30/274 (EP,US);
Y02A40/963 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/43] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage | [2002/06] | English: | Air conditioner | [2002/06] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement d'air | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 07.08.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4589262 (NAGAO MASAJI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 34 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 *; | [X]US4523631 (MCKINNEY DAVID A [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 47; figure 1 *; | [A]US5363668 (NAKAO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]US5289868 (KOSEKI YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 20 - column 8, line 12; figures 1-4 * |