EP1179871 - Electrochemical lithium ion secondary cell having multiplate electrodes with differing discharge rate regions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilson Greatbatch Limited 10000 Wehrle Drive Clarence New York 14031 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states Wilson Greatbatch Limited 10000 Wehrle Drive Clarence New York 14031 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spillman, David M. 126 Willow Breeze Road Tonawanda, NY 14223 / US | 02 /
Takeuchi, Esther S. 38 San Rafael Court East Amherst, NY 14051 / US | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306658.4 | 03.08.2001 | [2002/07] | Priority number, date | US20000632821 | 07.08.2000 Original published format: US 632821 | [2002/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1179871 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1179871 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, H01M10/04 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
H01M10/045 (EP,US);
H01M10/0413 (EP,US);
H01M10/0445 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0583 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
H01M6/103 (EP,US);
H01M16/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] | Title | German: | Mehrere plattenförmige Elektroden enthaltende elektrochemische Lithium-Ionen Sekundärzelle mit Regionen verschiedener Entladeräte | [2002/07] | English: | Electrochemical lithium ion secondary cell having multiplate electrodes with differing discharge rate regions | [2002/07] | French: | Pile secondaire multiplaques du type lithium-Ion comportant des régions à régime de décharge différent | [2002/07] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 05.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5439756 (ANANI ANABA A [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 1, lines 29-39 * * column 2, lines 8-25 * * column 6, lines 15-19; claims 1-20 *; | [Y]US5569553 (SMESKO SALLY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * column 3, lines 5-67 * * column 11, line 30 - column 12, line 40; claims 32-45 *; | [A]US5670266 (THOMAS GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 3,12,20* column 2, lines 36-65; claims 1,6,7 *; | [Y]US5935724 (SPILLMAN DAVID M [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 20; claims 1-42 *; | [A]EP0989624 (GREATBATCH W LTD [US]) [A] 1-35 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 24 * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 53 * * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 24; claims 1-21 *; | [PX]US6117585 (ANANI ANABA A [US], et al) [PX] 35 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 53 * * column 4, lines 45-54 * |