EP1182871 - Broadcast program recording and playing apparatus and portable terminal for recording and playing broadcast programs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/29] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawana, Koichi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Yoko, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Korehisa, Makoto, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/29] |
Former [2002/09] | 01 /
Kawana, Koichi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-Chome, Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takahashi, Yoko, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-Chome, Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Korehisa, Makoto, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-Chome, Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306829.1 | 10.08.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | JP20000246795 | 16.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000246795 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182871 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182871 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182871 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/782 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
H04N21/4227 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (KR);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/4135 (EP,US);
H04N21/42209 (EP,US);
H04N21/4222 (EP,US);
H04N21/42221 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N5/38 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/29] |
Former [2004/48] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anlage zum Aufnehmen und Abspielen von Fernsehprogrammen und tragbares Endgerät zum Aufnehmen und Abspielen von Fernsehprogrammen | [2002/09] | English: | Broadcast program recording and playing apparatus and portable terminal for recording and playing broadcast programs | [2002/09] | French: | Appareil pour enregistrer et reproduire des programmes de télévision, et dispositif terminal pour enregistrer et reproduire des programmes de télévision | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10172596.8 / EP2244478 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2343074 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,9-12 * page 2 * * page 3 * * page 4 * * page 9 * * page 10 * * page 20 * * figures 1-3,12,14,15 * [Y] 5,6,8,13,14,16; | [Y]US6075812 (CAFARELLA JOHN H [US], et al) [Y] 5,13 * abstract *; | [A]WO9904561 (GUIDE E INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5945988 (WILLIAMS CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9,13 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE19737651 (RIEMANN FRANK [DE]) [Y] 6,8,14,16 * pages 2-4 * * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 7,15 | by applicant | GB2343074 |