EP1184387 - Method for promoting dialkyldihalosilane formation during direct method alkylhalosilane production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lewis, Larry Neil 7 Harvest Drive Scotia, New York 12302 / US | 02 /
Ward, William Jessup 4028 Windsor Drive Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 03 /
Demoulpied, David Cheney 35 Commons Boulevard Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 04 /
Bablin, John Matthew 36 Ellsworth Street Amsterdam, New York 12010 / US | 05 /
Gardner, Martha Maples 4031 Buckingham Drive Niskayuna, New York 12304 / US | [2002/11] |
Former [2002/10] | 01 /
Lewis, Larry Neil 7 Harvest Drive Scotia, New York 12302 / US | ||
02 /
Ward, William Jessup 4028 Windsor Drive Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | |||
03 /
Demoulpied, David Cheney 35 Commons Boulevard Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | |||
04 /
Bablin, John Matthew 36 Ellsworth Street Amsterdam, New York 12010 / US | |||
05 /
Gardner, Martha Maples 2004 Regent Street Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307020.6 | 17.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | US20000655423 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: US 655423 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184387 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184387 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/16 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
C07F7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/40] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steigerung der Bildung von Dialkyldihalosilan während des Direkt-Verfahrens | [2002/10] | English: | Method for promoting dialkyldihalosilane formation during direct method alkylhalosilane production | [2002/10] | French: | Procédé d' augmentation de formation de silane dialkyl-dihalo pendant le "procédé direct" | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2003 | Request for further processing for: | 25.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1055675 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PX] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0063217 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PX] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0181354 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1156051 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US6005130 (LEWIS LARRY NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US5880307 (DAUGHERTY RICHARD DEWAYNE [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US5874604 (STEINER MATTHIAS-SVEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US5596119 (HALM ROLAND L [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US5312948 (FREEBURNE STEVEN K [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0604092 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0320260 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US4602101 (HALM ROLAND L [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document * |