EP1182713 - Magneto-resistive element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiramoto, Masayoshi 1863-2, Tawaraguchi-cho Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0243 / JP | 02 /
Matukawa, Nozomu 498,-2-1-101, Gakuenasahimotomachi, 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631-0015 / JP | 03 /
Odagawa, Akihiro 3-10-7-404, Ayameikekita Nara-shi, Nara 631-0032 / JP | 04 /
Iijima, Kenji 11-337-1-620, Shinmachi, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8081 / JP | 05 /
Sakakima, Hiroshi 20-19, Kasumizaka Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0352 / JP | [2002/18] |
Former [2002/09] | 01 /
Hiramoto, Masayoshi 1863-2, Tawaraguchi-cho Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0243 / JP | ||
02 /
Matukawa, Nozomu 498,-2-1-101, Gakuenasahimotomachi, 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631-0015 / JP | |||
03 /
Odagawa, Akihiro 3-10-7-404, Ayameikekita Nara-shi, Nara 631-0032 / JP | |||
04 /
Iijima, Kenji 950-2, Fukakusa-Minamihasuike-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-0036 / JP | |||
05 /
Sakakima, Hiroshi 20-19, Kasumizaka Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0352 / JP | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307109.7 | 21.08.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | JP20000249340 | 21.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000249340 | JP20000330254 | 30.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000330254 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182713 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182713 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L43/08, H01L43/12, H01F10/32, H01F41/30 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H01F10/14 (KR);
H10N50/10 (EP,US);
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
H01F10/3268 (EP,US);
H01F10/3272 (EP,US);
H01F41/302 (EP,US);
H10N50/01 (EP,US);
H10B61/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1107 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1121 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/02] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetoresistives Element | [2002/09] | English: | Magneto-resistive element | [2002/09] | French: | Elément magnétorésistif | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5390061 (NAKATANI RYOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,19,44-46 * column 11, lines 31-57; figure 5 *; | [A]US5408377 (GURNEY BRUCE A [US], et al) [A] 1,19,44-46 * column 5, lines 26-28; figure 6 * * column 8, lines 13-16 *; | [A]US5650958 (GALLAGHER WILLIAM JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,19,47 * column 7, lines 20-23 * * column 11, lines 21-23 *; | [XAY]EP0913830 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,5,7,19,24,25,29-31,34,37,47,54 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 54 * * column 7, line 1 - column 12, line 48 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 12,14,22,23,44,45,55,56; | [YA]DE19934009 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12,14 * page 31, line 68 - page 37, line 18; figures 7-10 * * page 37, line 19 - page 39, line 33; figures 11,12 * [A] 44-46; | [YA]US6051309 (FUJIKATA JUN-ICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 44 * abstract * * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 4 * [A] 45,46; | [XP]EP1033764 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5,7,17,19,24,32,34,38-42,47,54 * column 13, line 51 - column 14, line 17; figures 12,13 * * column 18, line 37 - column 20, line 21; figures 15,17 * * column 34, line 55 - column 35, line 37 *; | [XA] - PARKIN S S P ET AL, "EXCHANGE-BIASED MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTIONS AND APPLICATION TO NONVOLATILE MAGNETIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY (INVITED)", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19990415), vol. 85, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 5828 - 5833, XP000955325 [X] 19,47 * the whole document * [A] 1,44-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.369932 | [A] - MOON K-S ET AL, "EXCHANGE-BIASED MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTIONS: DEPENDENCE OF OFFSET FIELD ON JUNCTION WIDTH", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19990614), vol. 74, no. 24, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3690 - 3692, XP000850576 [A] 1,19 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.123222 | [YA] - VELOSO A ET AL, "SPIN VALVE SENSORS WITH SYNTHETIC FREE AND PINNED LAYERS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20000501), vol. 87, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 5744 - 5746, XP000947880 [Y] 45 * the whole document * [A] 1,19,41,46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.372508 | [A] - SAITO M ET AL, "PTMN SPIN VALVE WITH SYNTHETIC FERRIMAGNET FREE AND PINNED LAYERS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20000501), vol. 87, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 6974 - 6976, XP000954164 [A] 1,19,44-46 * page 6974 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.372904 | [A] - HU Y M ET AL, "MAGNETIC ANISOTROPY OF UNI80FE20/MO/CO SPIN-VALVE FILMS GROWN BY MBE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970901), vol. 33, no. 5, PART 2, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 3952 - 3954, XP000703265 [A] 44-46 * page 39525, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.619626 | [YA] - SAKAKIMA H ET AL, "Enhancement of MR ratios using thin oxide layers in PtMn and alpha-Fe2O3-based spin valves", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200002), vol. 210, no. 1-3, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 20 - 24, XP004186750 [Y] 22,23,55,56 * page 21; figure 1 * [A] 44-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(99)00768-4 | [AD] - CARDOSO S ET AL, "HIGH THERMAL STABILITY TUNNEL JUNCTIONS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20000501), vol. 87, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 6058 - 6060, XP000953924 [AD] 1,19,44-46 * page 6058 * * page 6060 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.372611 |