EP1184309 - Catenary conveyor belt support apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martin Engineering Company One Martin Place Neponset Illinois 61345-9766 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Martin Engineering Company One Martin Place Neponset, Illinois 61345-9766 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swinderman, R. Todd 9463 East 3000 Street Kewanee, Illinois 61443 / US | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307342.4 | 29.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | US20000228706P | 29.08.2000 Original published format: US 228706 P | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184309 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184309 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G39/14, B65G15/08 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B65G15/08 (EP,US);
B65G39/14 (EP,US);
B65G2201/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/21] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tragvorrichtung für Muldenförderband | [2002/10] | English: | Catenary conveyor belt support apparatus | [2002/10] | French: | Dispositif de support pour bande transporteuse caténaire | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/50] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4112113 ; | [A]US2987164 (GREGG ROBERT D, et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 9,10,18 *; | [A]US3147852 (HANSON JR WILLIAM) [A] 1 * figures 2,5 *; | [A]DE2416963 (FIVES CAIL BABCOCK) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 3; figure 3 *; | [A]US4280619 (WARD CHRISTOPHER J, et al) [A] 1 * figures 4,6 *; | [A]FR2764873 (BRUNONE RENE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5927478 (ARCHER NEIL F [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5938005 (STOKMAN JOHANNES EVERARDUS ANT [NL]) [A] 1-18 * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 26 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920804), vol. 0163, no. 59, Database accession no. (M - 1289), & JP4112113 A 19920414 (YOUKOU:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |