EP1184792 - Information processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogaki, Tadao, c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307372.1 | 30.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | JP20000262299 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000262299 | JP20000262298 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000262298 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184792 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184792 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/30, G01C21/32 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G01C21/387 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G01C21/30 (KR);
G01C21/383 (EP);
G01C21/3881 (EP);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2004/09] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungssystem | [2002/10] | English: | Information processing | [2002/10] | French: | Système de traitement d'informations | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/48] | 13.07.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.09.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP04076615.6 / EP1460556 | EP07020358.3 / EP1879116 | EP10174178.3 / EP2259192 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0436263 (DELORME DAVID M [US]) [X] 1-32 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 12 * * page 9, line 30 - line 31 * * page 11, line 48 - line 53 * * page 12, line 23 - page 17, line 12 * * figures 8-13 * [Y] 5,14; | [Y]WO0031663 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 5,14; | [A]US6092076 (MCDONOUGH WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 7, line 52 - line 59 * * column 8, line 38 - line 45 * * figure 9 *; | [E]EP1134674 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-32 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0188] * * paragraph [0239] * * figures 4,29,43,53 *; | [A] - LORENSEN L, "Using the common benefits from land information systems in the planning of a geographic facility management system", CIRED 1989. 10TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICITY DISTRIBUTION (CONF. PUBL. NO.305), BRIGHTON, UK, 8-12 MAY 1989, 1989, London, UK, IEE, UK, pages 505 - 509 vol.6, XP001147087 [A] 19-32 * page 1, line 1 - line 41 * | Examination | EP0559270 | EP0838663 | US5953722 | - "MANAGEMENT OF LARGE AMOUNTS OF DATA IN INTERACTIVE BUILDING WALKTHROUGHS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1992 SYMPOSIUM ON INTERACTIVE 3D GRAPHICS, Cambridge, MA, USA, (1992), ISBN 0-89791-467-8, pages 11 - 20 |