EP1184727 - Lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states ASM LITHOGRAPHY B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Laan, Hans Olmebeek 6 5501 CL Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
Dierichs, Marcel Chirurgijnstraat 1 5914 WR Venlo / NL | 03 /
van Greevenbroek, Hendrikus Robertus Marie Karel de Grote Laan 65 5615 SP Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Eurlings, Markus Franciscus Antonius Arenberglaan 159 4824 RK Breda / NL | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/10] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307429.9 | 31.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | EP20000307558 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: EP 00307558 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1184727 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
G03F7/70133 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/48] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lithographischer Apparat | [2002/10] | English: | Lithographic apparatus | [2002/10] | French: | Appareil lithographique | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2003 | 31.08.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0689099 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-23 * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 6 * * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 18 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0526242 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-23 * column 16, line 7 - line 29 * * figure 4 * |