EP1193834 - Miniature electric motor for generating vibration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MABUCHI MOTOR CO., LTD 430, Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states MABUCHI MOTOR CO., LTD 430, Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mabuchi, Takaichi, Mabuchi Motor Co., Ltd. 430 Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Needle, Jacqueline W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307577.5 | 06.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000274283 | 11.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000274283 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193834 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193834 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/06, B06B1/16, F16D1/10 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B06B1/16 (EP,US);
H02K7/061 (EP,US);
H02K7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49908 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49911 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18344 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | H02K7/06, B06B1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/39] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrischer Kleinmotor zur Erzeugung von Vibrationen | [2002/14] | English: | Miniature electric motor for generating vibration | [2002/14] | French: | Moteur électrique miniature pour la génération de vibrations | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 17.08.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000032708 ; | [Y]US4157225 (LEVINE FRED [US]) [Y] 1,2 * figure - *; | [Y]US4159433 (AMANO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 1, line 24 - column 1, line 28 * * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2522753 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 12-17* figure - *; | [A]DE3239418 (INFORS AG [CH]) [A] 8-10 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US5952745 (YASUDA HISAFUMI [JP]) [Y] 1,8,25 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0944156 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8,25 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000032708 A 20000128 (SEIKO PRECISION INC) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * |