EP1204212 - Method and apparatus for path metric processing in telecommunications systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bickerstaff, Mark Andrew 224 Marsden Rd. Carlingford, NSW 2118 / AU | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2002/19] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307699.7 | 11.09.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | US20000233369P | 18.09.2000 Original published format: US 233369 P | US20010908188 | 18.07.2001 Original published format: US 908188 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204212 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204212 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/27 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
H03M13/3922 (EP,US);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H03M13/3927 (EP,US);
H03M13/3961 (EP,US);
H03M13/41 (EP,US);
H03M13/4107 (EP,US);
H03M13/4169 (EP,US);
H03M13/6502 (EP,US);
H03M13/6505 (EP,US);
H03M13/6508 (EP,US);
H03M13/6511 (EP,US);
H03M13/6516 (EP,US);
H03M13/6566 (EP,US);
H04L1/0052 (EP,US);
H04L1/0054 (EP,US);
H04L1/0055 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/05] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Pfadmetrikverarbeitung in Telekommunikationssystemen | [2002/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for path metric processing in telecommunications systems | [2002/19] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le traitement des métriques de chemin dans les systèmes de télécommunications | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.06.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 13.08.2004 | Appeal received No. T1237/04 | 06.10.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.10.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 19.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.11.2008 | ES | 16.02.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/20] | ES | 16.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9952216 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO0126257 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]GB2357938 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI]) [PA] 1-10 * the whole document * |