EP1191473 - System and method for introducing a medical facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOZAN INC. 3-5-18, Kitazawa, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 155 / JP | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takatori, Sunao c/o Yozan Inc., Yozan Building, 3-5-18, Kitazawa Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yokoi, Takashi c/o Yozan Inc., Yozan Building, 3-5-18, Kitazawa Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kiyomatsu, Hisanori c/o Yozan Inc., Yozan Building, 3-5-18, Kitazawa Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Jones, Keith William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Jones, Keith William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307808.4 | 13.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | JP20000284913 | 20.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000284913 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191473 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191473 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
G16H70/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/35] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Vorschlagen einer medizinischer Anlage | [2002/13] | English: | System and method for introducing a medical facility | [2002/13] | French: | Système et méthode pour proposer un service médical | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.08.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9750050 (APEX INFORMATION SERVICES INC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * page 4, line 10 - page 18, line 11; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 4,6; | [YA]US5301105 (CUMMINGS JR DESMOND D [US]) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 38 * * column 4, line 4 - line 29; figure 1 * [A] 1-3,5-8; | [Y]WO9953389 (CYBERHEALTH INC [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 8 * * page 15, line 6 - line 12; figures 1,8,12 *; | [XA]US5911687 (SATO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 60 * [A] 2-6,8; | [A]US5964700 (TALLMAN JOSEPH P [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 4 * |