EP1188475 - Method for making probe support and apparatus used for the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Tadashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Nobuko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Hidenori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Tomohiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307932.2 | 18.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000284046 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000284046 | JP20010042344 | 19.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001042344 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1188475 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1188475 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C12Q1/68, B01L3/02, B41J2/14 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
B01L3/0268 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
B41J2/14137 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0036 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00378 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00527 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00529 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0059 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
B41J2002/1437 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | B01J19/00, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2004/16] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem Probenträger und Vorrichtung zur Anwendung bei diesem Verfahren | [2002/12] | English: | Method for making probe support and apparatus used for the method | [2002/12] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un support d'échantillon et dispositif utilisé dans le procédé | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6001309 (GAMBLE RONALD C [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 20 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 44 - line 63 * * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 55 * * column 6, line 21 - column 7, line 23 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 36; figures 2-10 *; | [X]US6083763 (BALCH WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 11, line 32 - column 16, line 11; figures 2-4 *; | [X]WO9715394 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 2; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US5338688 (DEEG ROLF [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - line 20 * * column 3, line 26 - line 65; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0895082 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 12 * * page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 5, paragraph 28 * * page 7, paragraph 38 - paragraph 39; figures 1,2; examples 1,2 *; | [X]EP0498291 (CANON INFORMATION SYST RES [AU], et al) [X] 10-18 * abstract * * page 5, line 9 - page 11, line 4 * * figures 1-48 *; | [E]WO0189694 (BIOROBOTICS LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 5; figure - * |