EP1189226 - Disc drive having an adjusting mechanism capable of easily and precisely adjusting a fixing position of a motor-chassis assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Ken'ichi, c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. Atsugi Operations Base, 1601, Sakai Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Tsukasa, c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. Atsugi Operations Base, 1601, Sakai Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2002/15] |
Former [2002/12] | 01 /
Hori, Ken'ichi, c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. Atsugi Operations Base, 1601, Sakai Atsugi-shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Yamada, Tsukasa, c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. Atsugi Operations Base, 1601, Sakai Atsugi-shi, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307965.2 | 19.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000283841 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000283841 | JP20000287990 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000287990 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189226 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189226 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/24, G11B7/08, G11B19/20 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
G11B21/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | G11B21/24, G11B7/08 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/28] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Plattenlaufwerk mit Abstimmungsmechanismus zur einfachen und präzisen Abstimmung einer Festposition einer Motorchassisvorrichtung | [2002/12] | English: | Disc drive having an adjusting mechanism capable of easily and precisely adjusting a fixing position of a motor-chassis assembly | [2002/12] | French: | Tourne-disque avec mécanisme de réglage pour le réglage facile et précis de la position fixe d'un dispositif de châssis-moteur | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10269579 ; | [X]WO9916069 (KENWOOD CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US6005836 (CHOI HAN-KOOK [KR]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10269579 A 19981009 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-4,6-8 |