EP1199607 - Two-components developer, and image forming apparatus and image forming method using the developer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Fumihiro 2657-73, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Iwamoto, Yasuaki 14-18, Ichimi-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsuda, Hiroaki 97-19, Miyamoto Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakai, Hiroshi 403, 5-11-10, Tsunashimahigashi, Kohoko-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Shu, Hyou 302, 3-18-19, Ohmiya-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 06 /
Kondo, Maiko 302, 1-36, Honda-machi Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 07 /
Higuchi, Hiroto 101, 387-1, Ohzuma Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307975.1 | 19.09.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | JP20000321397 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000321397 | JP20010273280 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001273280 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199607 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199607 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199607 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/083, G03G9/09 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
G03G9/1075 (EP,US);
G03G9/083 (EP,US);
G03G9/0834 (EP,US);
G03G9/0835 (EP,US);
G03G9/0837 (EP,US);
G03G9/0839 (EP,US);
G03G9/0904 (EP,US);
G03G9/113 (EP,US);
G03G9/1131 (EP,US);
G03G9/1139 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/28] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zwei-Komponentenentwickler, Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsverfahren | [2002/17] | English: | Two-components developer, and image forming apparatus and image forming method using the developer | [2002/17] | French: | Révélateur à deux composants, appareil de formation d'images et méthode de formation d'images l'utilisant | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4517268 (GRUBER ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,11,16-18 * example 3 *; | [A]EP0936507 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,18 * |