EP1193536 - A travelling wave-type optical modulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minakata, Makoto c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Jungo c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Atsuo c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 04 /
Aoki, Kenji c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 05 /
Mitomi, Osamu c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308018.9 | 20.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000289002 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000289002 | JP20010058083 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001058083 | US20010274492P | 09.03.2001 Original published format: US 274492 P | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193536 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193536 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193536 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/035, G02F1/225 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
G02F1/0356 (EP);
G02F1/0305 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | G02F1/035 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/43] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Wanderwellenmodulator | [2002/14] | English: | A travelling wave-type optical modulator | [2002/14] | French: | Modulateur optique à onde progressive | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0985948 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0828175 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH01232323 ; | [A]US5886807 (CUMMINGS URI [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 16; figures 2B,2C * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891211), vol. 013, no. 554, Database accession no. (P - 973), & JP01232323 A 19890918 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |