EP1195997 - Efficient communication with passive devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Right Chance Inc. P.O. Box 3340 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Right Chance Incorporated PO Box 3340 Road Town Tortola / VI | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanevsky, Dimitri c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. IPL, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 02 /
Sabath, Mariuz c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. IPL, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 03 /
Sedivy, Janm c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. IPL, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 04 /
Zlatsin, Alexander c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. IPL, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Meldrum, David James D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Meldrum, David James D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2002/15] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308221.9 | 27.09.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | US20000680711 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: US 680711 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1195997 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1195997 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/15] | Title | German: | Effiziente Kommunikation mit passiven Geräten | [2002/15] | English: | Efficient communication with passive devices | [2002/15] | French: | Communication efficace avec appareils passifs | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.04.2008 | 23.04.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/40] | 26.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9013989 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 9* page 1, line 10 - line 30 *; | [X]WO9608933 (SEIKO COMM SYS INC [US]) [X] 7,9 * page 6, line 6 - line 11 * * page 8, line 21; figures 1-3 * * page 8, line 5 - line 7 * * page 8, line 12 - line 13 * * page 16, line 12 - line 15 * * page 4, line 1 - line 3 * * page 7, line 10 - line 18 * * page 6, line 13 - line 14 * * page 8, line 22 *; | [X]WO9901995 (EIDGENOESS PTT [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 10; figure 1 * * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 10 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 3 * * page 5, line 4 - line 10 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 4 * * page 10, line 22 - line 32 * |