EP1236962 - Process and apparatus for producing a freeze-dried product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/36] | Freeze-dried product and process and apparatus for producing it | ||
[2006/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incorporated Administrative Agency National Agriculture and Bio-oriented Research Organization 1-1, Kannondai 3-Chome Tsukuba-Shi Ibaraki / JP | [2006/23] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Incorporated Administrative Agency National Agriculture and Bio-oriented Research Organization 1-1, Kannondai 3-Chome Tsukuba-Shi Ibaraki / JP | ||
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states National Agricultural Research Organisation (NARO) 1-1, Kannondai 3-Chome Tsukuba-Shi Ibaraki 305-8517 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horigane, Akira 16-520-201, Matsushiro 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308802.6 | 16.10.2001 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | JP20010057345 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001057345 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1236962 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1236962 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236962 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F26B5/06 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
F26B11/181 (EP,US);
F26B3/30 (EP,US);
F26B5/06 (EP,US);
F26B9/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/35] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines gefriergetrockneten Produktes | [2006/01] | English: | Process and apparatus for producing a freeze-dried product | [2006/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'un produit lyophilisé | [2006/01] |
Former [2002/36] | Gefriergetrocknetes Produkt sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [2002/36] | Freeze-dried product and process and apparatus for producing it | ||
Former [2002/36] | Produit lyophilisé et son procédé et dispositif de fabrication | Examination procedure | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2215265 (FLOSDORF EARL W) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2388917 (HORMEL JAY C) [A] 1,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1102654 (LEYBOLD HOCHVAKUUM ANLAGEN) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1378749 (LEYBOLD HOCHVAKUUM ANLAGEN) [A] 1,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5309649 (BERGMANN THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column W *; | [A]WO9631748 (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29621917U (MULTIMATIC REINIGUNGS SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 10* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0917825 (HORIGANE AKIRA [JP], et al) [DA] 1,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6163979 (OETJEN GEORG-WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 2-5,8,9 * column W * | by applicant | JPH035657B |