EP1215179 - Method of fabricating a preform and optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Yoshinori 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308881.0 | 19.10.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000380665 | 14.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000380665 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215179 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215179 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/014, C03B37/027, C03C25/60 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
C03B37/0124 (EP,US);
C03B37/01413 (EP,US);
C03B37/01446 (EP,US);
C03C25/607 (EP,US);
C03C25/64 (EP,US);
C03B2201/075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/37] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Vorform und optischer Faser | [2002/25] | English: | Method of fabricating a preform and optical fiber | [2002/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d une preforme et d une fibre | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 08.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5318611 (MERRITT TREVOR [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 38 - line 48; figure 2 *; | [YD]EP0887670 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [YD] 1,2 * figures 3,8; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US4685945 (FREUND FRIEDEMANN [US]) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5238479 (OHGA YUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4737179 (TANAKA GOTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 4 - line 55; claim 4 *; | [A] - MORIYAMA T ET AL, Ultimately low OH content VAD optical fibres, ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, VOL. 16, NR. 18, PAGE(S) 698-699, ISSN 0013-5194, XP002081489 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |