EP1304520 - Pipe fittings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Hong Kong and China Gas Company Limited 23rd Floor, 363 Java Road North Point Hong Kong / CN | [2006/31] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states The Hong Kong and China Gas Company Limited 23rd Floor, 363 Java Road North Point, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, Alfred Wing Kin 23rd Floor, 363 Java Road North Point, Hong Kong / CN | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308912.3 | 19.10.2001 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304520 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1304520 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/00, F16L41/02 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
F16L15/008 (EP);
F16L41/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | 17.09.2003 | LT | 17.09.2003 | LV | 17.09.2003 | MK | 17.09.2003 | RO | 17.09.2003 | SI | 17.09.2003 | Title | German: | Rohranschlüsse | [2003/17] | English: | Pipe fittings | [2003/17] | French: | Raccords de tuyauterie | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | BE | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | IT | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | IE | 19.10.2006 | LU | 19.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 19.10.2006 | ||
LU | 19.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 19.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 19.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2062145 (PICKOP GEORGE B) [X] 1,3,4 * figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US1115912 (DODSON ROYAL E [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE8913648U (GUO) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2239942 (FREDERICK STONE, et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-11 * |