EP1208833 - Walking aid for the disabled [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duff, Mark New Concept, 2 Bermuda Road, Ransomes Euro Park Ipswich, Suffolk IP3 3RU / GB | For all designated states Flounders, Michael New Concept, 2 Bermuda Road, Ransomes Euro Park Ipswich Suffolk IP3 3RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Duff, Mark New Concept, 2 Bermuda Road, Ransomes Euro Park Ipswich, Suffolk IP3 3RU / GB | ||
For all designated states Flounders, Michael New Concept, 2 Bermuda Road, Ransomes Euro Park Ipswich, Suffolk IP3 3RU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al KEITH W. NASH & Co., 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308969.3 | 22.10.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | GB20000026792 | 02.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0026792 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1208833 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1208833 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/04 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
A61H3/04 (EP);
A61H2003/002 (EP);
A61H2003/046 (EP);
A61H2201/1633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gehhilfe für Behinderte | [2002/22] | English: | Walking aid for the disabled | [2002/22] | French: | Déambulateur pour handicapé | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.08.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2168424 (SKINNER EUGENE C, et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 2, line 20 - line 22; figure 1 * * column 3, line 4 - line 5 * * column 4, line 18 - line 55 * [A] 8-10 [Y] 5; | [XA]WO9833466 (HALL GEORGE ROBERTS [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * page 2, line 1 - line 23 * [A] 5; | [Y]US3000645 (SCHMIDT CARL O) [Y] 5 * figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0729737 (PREMIS MED BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,6,8,10; | [XA]US5351700 (JONES III CLAYTON H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10 * the whole document * [A] 3-6,8,9; | [A]US5443304 (FOCHS ARTHUR J [US]) [A] 8 * the whole document * |