EP1203965 - System and method for distribution of GPS satellite information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trimble Navigation Limited 935 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Trimble Navigation Limited 935 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states At Road, Inc. 47200 Bayside Parkway Fremont, California 94538 / US | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Road, Inc. 4700 Bayside Parkway Freemont, California 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan, Rodric C. 323 Loner Vinters Circle Fremont, California 94539 / US | 02 /
Enge, Per K. 1549 Fordham Way Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/05] | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2002/19] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309223.4 | 31.10.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | US20000707326 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: US 707326 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1203965 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1203965 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00, G01S5/14 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
G01S19/05 (EP,US);
G01S5/0027 (EP,US);
G01S5/0045 (EP,US);
G01S19/254 (EP,US);
G01S19/256 (EP,US);
G01S19/258 (EP,US);
G01S2205/008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/17] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung von GPS Satelliteninformation | [2002/19] | English: | System and method for distribution of GPS satellite information | [2002/19] | French: | Procédé et système de distribution d'information des satellites GPS | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 31.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/41] | 07.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/41] | Request for further processing for: | 01.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 01.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9956144 (SNAPTRACK INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,12-27,29-32,36,39,41-44,47-60,62,63,66-68,71-74 * column A; figures 2A,2B,3,8-10; table 1 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 21 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 11 * * page 12, line 28 - line 33 * * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 18 * * page 16, line 33 - page 17, line 9 * * page 23, line 31 - page 30, line 7 * [Y] 35; | [X]WO9956145 (SNAPTRACK INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,12-18,20,21,23-26,28,36-38,41-44,47-55,57,59,60,62-68,71-74 * column A; figures 1,2,3B,4 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 8 * * page 8, line 29 - page 10, line 24 * * page 14, line 12 - line 28 *; | [XY]EP0874248 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-10,15-19,21,24-26,28,33,36,39-45,50-53,55,59-63,66-69,74 * column A; figures 2,3 * * column 2, line 36 - line 56 * * column 4, line 38 - line 45 * * column 5, line 38 - column 8, line 13 * [Y] 35; | [X]WO9954753 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 1,3-9,14-19,24-27,33,34,36,39-44,49-53,59-63,66-68,73,74 * column A; figure 2 * * page 3, line 24 - line 29 * * page 5, line 20 - line 22 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 27 *; | [XP]EP1148344 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XP] 1,2 * page 6, line 42 - line 52 *; | [A]WO0019231 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,36,59 * column A; figure 2 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 12 * |