EP1203597 - Hinged spacer element for joining radioactive seeds used in treatment of cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grimm, Peter D. 1211 East Newton Seattle, WA 98102 / US | [2002/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309309.1 | 02.11.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | US20000707622 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: US 707622 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1203597 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1203597 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
A61N5/1027 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/19] | Title | German: | Drehbarer Distanzhalter zur Verbindung radioaktiver Quellen die in der Krebstherapie verwendet werden | [2002/19] | English: | Hinged spacer element for joining radioactive seeds used in treatment of cancer | [2002/19] | French: | Elément articulé d'espacement pour joindre des sources radioactives utilisées pour le traitement du cancer | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 15.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4697575 (HOROWITZ BRUCE S [US]); | [A]EP0668088 (AMERSHAM HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,5 *; | [AD]US6010446 (GRIMM PETER D [US]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6010446 |