EP1233397 - A method and apparatus for driving a plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 1815-1, Ohaza Tajiri Kunitomi-cho Higashimorokata-gun Miyazaki 880-1194 / JP | [2008/39] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Akira, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd., 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 02 /
Kuriyama, Hirohito, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd., 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Ayahito, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd., 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 04 /
Toda, Kosaku, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd., 2-1 Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309476.8 | 09.11.2001 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | JP20010017471 | 25.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001017471 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1233397 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1233397 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
G09G3/2029 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G3/2803 (EP,US);
G09G3/2944 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0266 (EP,US);
G09G3/204 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/50] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Steuern einer Plasmaanzeigetafel | [2002/34] | English: | A method and apparatus for driving a plasma display panel | [2002/34] | French: | Procédé et appareil de commande d'un panneau d'affichage à plasma | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 19.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.04.2008 | 19.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0774745 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,9,13 * column 25, lines 12-32 * * column 27, line 44 - column 28, line 7; figure 26 *; | [XY]JPH10207426 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) [X] 3,7 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0028] - [0034] - [0046]; figures 4,5,9 *[Y] 4,8; | [XYA]EP0982707 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,7,9,13 * paragraphs [0006] - [0013] - [0016] - [0023]; figure 3 * [Y] 4,8 [A] 2; | [X]US6144364 (OTOBE YUKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 34, line 27 - column 37, line 60; figures 65-67 *; | [PX]WO0129812 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,9,13 * paragraphs [0057] - [0060] - [0069] , [0070]; figures 3,7 * | Examination | EP0896317 | DE19837307 | US7023406 |