EP1205291 - Method and apparatus for determining separating force of molded product from mold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Aza-komanba Shibokusa, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiguchi, Masao 1517-13, Funatsu, Kawaguchikomachi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0301 / JP | 02 /
Uchiyama, Tatsuhiro 2-20-3, Higashitanaka Gotenbe-shi, Shizuoka 412-0026 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Hiroshi 1126-3, Shimoyoshida Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi 403-0004 / JP | [2004/10] |
Former [2002/20] | 01 /
Kamiguchi, Masao 1517-13, Funatsu, Kawaguchikomachi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0301 / JP | ||
02 /
Uchiyama, Tatsuhiro 2-20-3, Higashitanake Gotenbe-shi, Shizuoka 412-0026 / JP | |||
03 /
Watanabe, Hiroshi 1126-3, Shimoyoshida Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi 403-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309478.4 | 09.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | JP20000343141 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000343141 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205291 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205291 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/76, B29C45/40 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
B29C45/4005 (EP,US);
B29C45/7626 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1798 (EP,US);
B29C2045/764 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Abscheidungskraft eines Formlings vom Formwerkzeug | [2002/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining separating force of molded product from mold | [2002/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer la force de séparation du moule d'un objet moulé | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]JPS56146713 ; | [Y]JP2000108183 ; | [A]JPH01244816 ; | [A]JP01071722 ; | [A]JPS61182916 | [DYA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820220), vol. 006, no. 029, Database accession no. (M - 113), & JP56146713 A 19811114 (TOSHIBA CORP) [DY] 1,3,8,10 * abstract * [A] 2,4-7,9,11-14 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000108183 A 20000418 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [Y] 1,3,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891221), vol. 013, no. 582, Database accession no. (M - 911), & JP01244816 A 19890929 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [A] 4-7,11-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890623), vol. 013, no. 274, Database accession no. (M - 841), & JP01071722 A 19890316 (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO) [A] 2,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870108), vol. 011, no. 006, Database accession no. (M - 551), & JP61182916 A 19860815 (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO) [A] 1,3,6-8,10,13,14 * abstract * |