EP1255138 - Positive dispersion optical fiber having large effective area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/45] | Positive dipersion optical fiber having large effective area | ||
[2003/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Lucas 301 Spring Woood Court Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104-4515 / US | 02 /
Peckham, David W. 632 Hamilton Avenue Lawrenceville, Georgia 30044 / US | 03 /
Reed, William A. 143 Blackburn Road Summmit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 04 /
Yan, Man Fei 75 Highland Circle Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/45] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01309523.7 | 12.11.2001 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | US20010844643 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: US 844643 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255138 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255138 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/22, G02B6/16 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
G02B6/0365 (EP,US);
G02B6/02019 (EP,US);
G02B6/02242 (EP,US);
G02B6/03627 (EP,US);
G02B6/03644 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/30] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optische Faser mit positiver Dispersion und grosser effektiver Fläche | [2002/45] | English: | Positive dispersion optical fiber having large effective area | [2003/07] | French: | Fibre optique à grande aire effective avec dispersion positive | [2002/45] |
Former [2002/45] | Positive dipersion optical fiber having large effective area | Examination procedure | 12.11.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4852968 (REED WILLIAM A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 6 * * column 10, line 67 - column 11, line 17 *; | [A]WO0111402 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 29; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0789255 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,6,7; examples 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO0065387 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 10, paragraph 2 * | [A] - REED W A ET AL, "TAILORING OPTICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF DISPERSION-SHIFTED LIGHTGUIDES FOR APPLICATIONS NEAR 1.55 M", AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, AMERICAN TELEPHONE AND TELEGRAPH CO. NEW YORK, US, (19860901), vol. 65, no. 5, ISSN 8756-2324, pages 105 - 122, XP000029694 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 117, column L, paragraph 2 - page 119, column R, paragraph L * |