EP1205899 - Simulation methods and systems for the installation and the operation of a medical image diagnostic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshizawa, Nobuhiro 7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Toyko 191-8503 / JP | 02 /
Tsuchiya, Tomotoshi 7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Toyko 191-8503 / JP | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/20] | Goode, Ian Roy GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309546.8 | 13.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | JP20000347258 | 14.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000347258 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1205899 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1205899 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G09B23/28, G09B9/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
G09B23/28 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/20] | G09B23/28, G09B9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/35] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Simulationsverfahren und -systeme zur Einrichtung und Bedienung einer medizinischen Bilddiagnosevorrichtung | [2002/20] | English: | Simulation methods and systems for the installation and the operation of a medical image diagnostic device | [2002/20] | French: | Méthodes et systèmes de simulation d'installation et d'utilisation d'un dispositif de diagnostique par imagerie médicale | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6052669 (SMITH WARD W [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - line 21 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 29 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 53 *; | [X]US5255207 (CORNWELL LARRY [US]) [X] 1,7,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 22 * * column 7, line 60 - line 65 *; | [X]US5800178 (GILLIO ROBERT G [US]) [X] 2,3,5,6,8,9 * column 2, line 39 - line 57 * * column 4, line 39 - line 46 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 6 * * column 16, line 7 - line 23 *; | [A] - "Nokia 9110 Communicator: Applications", NOKIA.COM, (20001018), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20001018143457/www.nokia.com/phones/9110/app.html, (20020826), XP002211210 [A] 2,3,5,6,8,9 * the whole document * |