EP1211049 - Method and apparatus for rubber extrusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2011/04] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohki, Masahiko, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3 chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/23] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309772.0 | 21.11.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | JP20000355991 | 22.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000355991 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1211049 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1211049 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211049 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/12, B29D30/62 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
B29C48/305 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29K2019/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | B29C47/12, B29D30/62, // B29K221:00 | ||
Former IPC [2002/23] | B29C47/14, // B29L30:00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/32] |
Former [2002/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Strangpressen von Kautschuk | [2010/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for rubber extrusion | [2002/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'extrusion de caoutchouc | [2002/23] |
Former [2002/23] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stangpressen von Kautschuk | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2566854 (RHODES THOMAS J) [X] 1,2,6,7,11 * column 4, line 12 - line 18 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 20 *; | [A]US4439125 (DIECKMANN J ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 7 * figure 2 *; | [X]US4515738 (ANDERS DIETMAR [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [X]US4556382 (NADEAU JR JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US4609336 (STEVENSON JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 6; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0733457 (UNIROYAL ENGLEBERT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0835735 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 7-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9938664 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 15-17 *; | [A] - HUREZ P ET AL, "A NEW DESIGN PROCEDURE FOR PROFILE EXTRUSION DIES", POLYMER ENGINEERING & SCIENCE, SOCIETY OF PLASTICS ENGINEERS, US, (19960315), vol. 36, no. 5, ISSN 0032-3888, pages 626 - 635, XP000594967 [A] 7-11 * page 626, line L, paragraph 2 - line R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pen.10450 |