EP1221508 - Vehicle impact attenuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY ABSORPTION SYSTEMS, INC. One East Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states ENERGY ABSORPTION SYSTEMS, INC. One East Wacker Drive Chicago, Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephens, Barry D. 210 Diamond Oaks Road Roseville, California 95678 / US | 02 /
Buehler, Michael J. 1121 Cresthaven Drive Roseville, California 95678 / US | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309844.7 | 22.11.2001 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | US20010753476 | 03.01.2001 Original published format: US 753476 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221508 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1221508 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/14, E01F15/00 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
E01F15/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/28] | E01F15/14 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/03] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aufpralldämpfer für Fahrzeug | [2002/28] | English: | Vehicle impact attenuator | [2002/28] | French: | Amortisseur d'impact pour véhicule | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/32] | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.12.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.12.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4583716 (STEPHENS BARRY D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13-15 * column 2, line 60 - column 8, line 17; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5568913 (NAGLER YAACOV [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]EP0773326 (ENERGY ABSORPTION SYSTEM [US]) [X] 13-15 * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 14; figures 2-5 * [A] 1,2; | [PX]US2002154946 (STEPHENS BARRY D [US], et al) [PX] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-16 * | by applicant | US4352484 | US4452431 | US4635981 | US4645375 | US4674911 | US4711481 | US5011326 | US5733062 | US5875875 |