EP1209928 - A server and a method of providing content using a server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kokkinen, Heikki Cityhouse 101, 15-7 Oyamacho Shibuyaku, Tokyo 151-0065 / JP | 02 /
Uno, Shintaro 577-33, Shimo-ongatamachi Hachiojishi, Tokyo 192-0154 / JP | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2002/22] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309885.0 | 23.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | GB20000028812 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0028812 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1209928 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1209928 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209928 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20, H04L12/28 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H04W88/14 (EP,US);
H04N21/2146 (EP,US);
H04N21/25875 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04W84/005 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Server und Verfahren zum Bereitstellen von Inhalten unter Verwendung eines Servers | [2002/22] | English: | A server and a method of providing content using a server | [2002/22] | French: | Un serveur et un procédé de fournir des contenus en utilisant un serveur | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2005 | BE | 27.07.2005 | CH | 27.07.2005 | FI | 27.07.2005 | LI | 27.07.2005 | NL | 27.07.2005 | TR | 27.07.2005 | DK | 27.10.2005 | GR | 27.10.2005 | SE | 27.10.2005 | CY | 23.11.2005 | IE | 23.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | PT | 27.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]EP0936829 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [XD] 1,6,8,13 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0041]; figure 5; claims 9,10 * [Y] 2-5,7,9,10; | [XY] - ALBRECHT M ET AL, "IP services over Bluetooth: leading the way to a new mobility", LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 1999. LCN '99. CONFERENCE ON LOWELL, MA, USA 18-20 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991018), ISBN 0-7695-0309-8, pages 2 - 11, XP010358529 [X] 1,6,8,13 * page 2, column R, line 3 - line 5 * * page 4, column L, line 1 - column R, line 8 * * page 6, paragraph 4.1 * * page 8, line 45 - line 50 * [Y] 2-5,7,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.1999.801990 | [Y] - FENTON C ET AL, "WIRELESS ACCESS", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, BT LABORATORIES, GB, (200007), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 1358-3948, pages 74 - 86, XP000967883 [Y] 2-5,10 * Sections 3.4 to 3.7; page 81, column R - page 82, column R * * Section 5. "Solutions for wireless access to a carrier-scale IP network"; page 85 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1026736728715 | [ADY] - LIND R ET AL, "THE NETWORK VEHICLE - A GLIMPSE INTO THE FUTURE OF MOBILE MULTI-MEDIA", IEEE AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS MAGAZINE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199909), vol. 14, no. 9, ISSN 0885-8985, pages 27 - 32, XP000941847 [AD] 1-8,10,13 * Section titled "News and Entertainment - Getting There is More Than Half the Fun"; page 32, column R * [Y] 9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/62.793450 | [A] - MIYATSU K, "BLUETOOTH DESIGN BACKGROUND AND ITS TECHNOLOGICAL FEATURES", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (200011), vol. E83-A, no. 11, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 2048 - 2053, XP001039053 [A] 1-10,13 * abstract * * Section 2.6 "Security Functions"; page 2051 * | [X] - GU D L ET AL, "UAV aided intelligent routing for ad-hoc wireless network in single-area theater", 2000 IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE. CONFERENCE RECORD (CAT. NO.00TH8540), PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING, CHICAGO, IL, USA, 23-28 SEPT. 2000, 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-6596-8, pages 1220 - 1225 vol.3, XP002203046 [X] 14 * Sections 1 "Introduction and Background" and 2 "2-level Heterogeneous Ad-Hoc Wireless Network with UAV"; page 1220, column L - page 1222, column L * | [A] - YUH-SHYAN CHEN ET AL, "MESH: multi-eye spiral-hopping routing protocol in a wireless ad hoc network", PROCEEDINGS NINTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS (CAT.NO.00EX440), PROCEEDINGS NINTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, LAS VEGAS, NV, USA, 16-18 OCT. 2000, 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-6494-5, pages 657 - 661, XP002203047 [A] 14 * the whole document * | [A] - ACAMPORA A ET AL, "UNINET: A HYBRID APPROACH FOR UNIVERSAL BROADBAND ACCESS USING SMALL RADIO CELLS INTERCONNECTED BY FREE-SPACE OPTICAL LINKS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19980801), vol. 16, no. 6, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 973 - 987, XP000777964 [A] 14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.709456 |