EP1216886 - Sealing of a vehicle door trim panel with a connector housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Light Vehicle Systems-France 105, route d'Orléans 45600 Sully sur Loire / FR | [2005/35] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Arvinmeritor Light Vehicle Systems-France 105, route d'Orléans 45600 Sully sur Loire / FR | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Meritor Light Vehicle Systems-France 105 route d'Orléans, B.P. 48 45600 Sully sur Loire / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawrie, Mark Graham La Belle Etoile 45600 Lion en Sulias / FR | 02 /
Le Gallo, Yann 1 Rue Des Reinettes 4510 Orleans / FR | 03 /
De Vries, Pascal 25, Avenue Des Chataigniers 45640 Sandillion / FR | 04 /
Blume, Klaus Industriestrasse 23 64569 Nauheim / DE | 05 /
Hopson, Charles Berry 1921 Pointe Barton Drive Lebanon TN 37087 / US | 06 /
Laurandel, Herve 8 Close de la Scirpe 14200 Herouville, St Claire / FR | 07 /
Dobson, Simon Blair 5 The Corniche Sandgate, Kent CT20 3TA / GB | 08 /
Cabanne, Damien 11Bis, Rue d'Avon 77 Fontainebleau / FR | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310126.6 | 04.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | GB20000030894 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0030894 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1216886 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1216886 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216886 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02, H02G3/10, H02G3/08, B60R13/06, H01R13/52, B60R16/02 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B60R11/02 (EP,US);
B60R13/06 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0021 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/26] | B60R13/02, H02G3/08, H02G3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/44] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dichtung einer Fahrzeugtür-Innenverkleidung mit einem Gehaüsestecker | [2002/26] | English: | Sealing of a vehicle door trim panel with a connector housing | [2002/26] | French: | Etanchéité d'une garniture de porte de véhicule avec un boitier de connection | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 05.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5924872 (TAKIGUCHI SHUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,4 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 7 *; | [Y]DE3309149 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 2; figure - *; | [Y]GB2292267 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * page 6, paragraphs 2,3; figure 8 *; | [Y]US4058358 (CARLISLE ROGER P) [Y] 1-6,9 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0381024 (GEBHARD DIETRICH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 34; figure 3 * |