EP1220371 - Divided connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nankou, Yuuichi, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310231.4 | 06.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP20000393401 | 25.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000393401 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1220371 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1220371 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1220371 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629, H01R43/26 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
H01R13/641 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | H01R13/629 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/22] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zweiteiliger Verbinder | [2002/27] | English: | Divided connector | [2002/27] | French: | Connecteur consistant en deux parties | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5951316 (KAWANO KYOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]EP0562311 (HOSIDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 44 - line 49 *; | [A]DE19844695 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 22 *; | [A]EP0711006 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |