EP1216836 - Fluid-jet printhead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/26] | Fluid-jet printhead and method of fabrication thereof | ||
[2003/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Zhizang 4411 Snowbrush Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Xu, Genbao 1774 East Winchester Place Chandler, AZ 85249 / US | 03 /
Johnstone, Mark Alan 33949 Bond Road Lebanon, OR 97355 / US | 04 /
Whitlock, John P. P.O. Box 1202 Corvallis, OR 97339 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/26] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310295.9 | 10.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | US20000747725 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 747725 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216836 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216836 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/16 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
B41J2/1632 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (KR);
B41J2/14129 (EP,US);
B41J2/1603 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1629 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/1643 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49039 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49082 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49083 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49087 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49099 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/12] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsstrahldruckkopf | [2003/20] | English: | Fluid-jet printhead | [2003/20] | French: | Tête d'impression à jet de liquide | [2003/20] |
Former [2002/26] | Flüssigkeitsstrahldruckkopf und Verfahren für dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [2002/26] | Fluid-jet printhead and method of fabrication thereof | ||
Former [2002/26] | Tête d'impression à jet de liquide et procédé de sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 02.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 28.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03077263.6 / EP1369241 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0514706 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 38 - column 9, line 9; figures 1,6 *; | [A]US5459501 (LEE STEVEN S [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 28; figures 6,12 *; | [A]EP0674995 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 8 - column 8, line 56; figures 1A-C *; | [A]JPH10119341 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10119341 A 19980512 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |