EP1295928 - Hydrofluorocarbon refrigerant compositions soluble in lubricating oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Rajiv R 18 Foxfire Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | 02 /
Pham, Hang T 136 Larkspur Lane Amhert, New YOrk 14228 / US | 03 /
Wilson, David P 118 Waxwing Court East Amhert, New York 14051 / US | 04 /
Metcalf, David A. 20 Harriet Drive Whippany, New Jersey 07981 / US | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310350.2 | 11.12.2001 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | US20010960217 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 960217 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295928 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1295928 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C10M171/00, C09K5/04 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C09K2205/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/13] | C09K5/04, C10M171/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/52] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | In Schmieröl lösliche Fluorkohlenwasserstoff- Kühlmittelzusammensetzung | [2003/13] | English: | Hydrofluorocarbon refrigerant compositions soluble in lubricating oil | [2003/13] | French: | Compositions de fluide frigorigène hydrofluorocarboné solublés dans un lubrifiant | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0123493 (REFRIGERANT PRODUCTS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11 * page 1 * * page 5, line 4 - line 17 * * figure 7; examples 1-3; claims 1,7-9,13-15 *; | [X]JPH09208940 ; | JPH09208940 [ ]; | [E]WO0226912 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [E] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A]EP0659862 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2356867 (RHODIA LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4,5,9,11 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 42, Database accession no. 1997-454151, XP002194080 & JPH09208940 A 19970812 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,11 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09208940 A 19970812 (SANYO ELECTRIC) [ ] * abstract * |