EP1320216 - Method and device for multicast transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Barry George William, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department - PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Lloyd, Barry George William, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310356.9 | 11.12.2001 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1320216 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04L12/26, H04N7/24 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
H04L41/5025 (EP,US);
H04L12/1886 (EP,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,US);
H04N19/115 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/152 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (EP,US);
H04N19/40 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Mehrfachsendung | [2003/25] | English: | Method and device for multicast transmission | [2003/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de multidiffusion | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/43] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2003/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6215774 (KNAUERHASE ROBERT CONRAD [US], et al) [X] 18-21 * abstract * [Y] 6,7,14,15; | [XY] - ZHAO SONGSHENG ET AL, "Dynamic quality of session control of real-time video multicast", INTELLIGENT PROCESSING SYSTEMS, 1997. ICIPS '97. 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BEIJING, CHINA 28-31 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971028), ISBN 0-7803-4253-4, pages 1737 - 1741, XP010276324 [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,11,13,16 * page 1738, column L, line 46 - page 1740, column L, line L * [Y] 3,6,7,12,14,15 | [Y] - RAMANUJAN R S ET AL, "Adaptive streaming of MPEG video over IP networks", LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 22ND ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA 2-5 NOV. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971102), ISBN 0-8186-8141-1, pages 398 - 409, XP010252445 [Y] 3,12 * page 398, column R, line 6 - page 399, column L, line 8 * * page 401, column L, line 34 - column R, line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.1997.631009 | [X] - VICKERS B J ET AL, "Adaptive multicast of multi-layered video: rate-based and credit-based approaches", INFOCOM '98. SEVENTEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 29 MARCH-2 APRIL 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980329), ISBN 0-7803-4383-2, pages 1073 - 1083, XP010270328 [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13,14 * page 1073, column R, line 8 - line 39 * * page 1074, column R, line 43 - page 1076, column R, line L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1998.662917 |