EP1217469 - Method for producing holographic optical element comprising primary and complementary holograms and associated methods for establishing authenticity of element used as security device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stevenson, Sylvia Hewitt 35 Indian Field Road Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310384.1 | 12.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | US20000741944 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: US 741944 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217469 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217469 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/20, G03H1/04, G06K19/00, G03H1/24 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
G03H1/202 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0417 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/26] | G03H1/20 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/23] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines holographischen optischen Elements, das primäre und komplementäre Hologramme enthält, und zugehörige Verfahren zur Feststellung der Echtheit von einem als Sicherheitsmerkmal verwendeten Element | [2002/26] | English: | Method for producing holographic optical element comprising primary and complementary holograms and associated methods for establishing authenticity of element used as security device | [2002/26] | French: | Méthode de production d'un élément optique holographique comprenant des hologrammes primaires et complémentaires et méthode associée pour établir l'authenticité d'un élément utilisé comme dispositif de sécurité | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4959283 (SMOTHERS WILLIAM K [US], et al) [Y] 3* column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 4 *; | [XY]EP0821293 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-6 * column 26, line 50 - column 27, line 46 * * column 14, lines 15-25; figures 6,18A,18B * [Y] 3 |