EP1319474 - Screw driving gun having a slider member provided with a screw guiding spring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Super Power Screw Co. Ltd 9F-4, No. 666, Sec.2, Wu-CHuan W. Rd., Nan-Tun Dlts Taichung City / TW | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Sen-Yang No.49, Lane 193, Kang-Shan N. Rd. Kang Shan Chen, Kaohsiung Hsien / TW | 02 /
Chen, I-Jen No. 46, Lane 774, Sec. 1, Sha-Tien Rd. She-Chiao Tsun, Ta-tu H., Taichung Hsien / TW | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310507.7 | 17.12.2001 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1319474 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B25B23/10, B25B23/00, B25B23/04 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
B25B23/10 (EP);
B25B23/005 (EP);
B25B23/045 (EP);
B25B23/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/11] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Setzen von Schrauben mit einem Schieber, der eine Feder für die Führung der Schrauben aufweist | [2003/25] | English: | Screw driving gun having a slider member provided with a screw guiding spring | [2003/25] | French: | Dispositif de vissage avec un élément coulissant pourvu d'un ressort de guidage des vis | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 16.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6138536 (CHEN SEN-YANG [TW]) [A] 1 * figures 3-5; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH0871939 ; | [A]DE3832343 (CURTO EDOARDO [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5806381 (LIN CHING CHOU [TW]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 61 - line 63; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5791207 (AHDOOT NED M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5660090 (DERI YOSEF [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 10 - line 19; figures 3,9 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08071939 A 19960319 (PUROSU:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |