EP1220534 - Image sensor with correlated double sampling technique using switched-capacitor technology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symagery Microsystems Inc. 3026 Solandt Road Ottawa Ontario K2K 2A5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Symagery Microsystems Inc. 3026 Solandt Road Ottawa, Ontario K2K 2A5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hua, Paul 30 Laxford Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3E3 / CA | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310577.0 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | US20000256491P | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 256491 P | CA20012350416 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: CA 2350416 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1220534 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
H04N25/616 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/13] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildsensor mit doppelter korrelierter Signalabtastung mit geschalteten Kapazitäten | [2002/27] | English: | Image sensor with correlated double sampling technique using switched-capacitor technology | [2002/27] | French: | Capteur d'image à double échantillonnage correlé utilisant un circuit à capacités commutées | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.02.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5796431 (YONEMOTO KAZUYA [JP]); | [A]WO9946929 (PHOTOBIT CORP [US]); | [A]WO0062530 (NUCORE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) |