EP1217119 - Water-soluble, water/oil repellent treating composition and method of making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyadai, Shinji, Shin Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Silicone-Materials Res. Ctr., 1-10 Oaza Hitomo Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsumara, Kazuyuki, Shin Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Silicone-Materials Res. Ctr., 1-10 Oaza Hitomo Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Akira, Shin Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Silicone-Materials Res. Ctr., 1-10 Oaza Hitomo Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310597.8 | 19.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | JP20000390204 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000390204 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1217119 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1217119 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/657, D06M15/643, D06M15/647, D06M13/513, C08G77/26, C09D183/04, C09D183/08, // D06M23:06 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
C08G77/24 (EP,US);
C09D183/08 (EP,US);
D06M13/513 (EP,US);
D06M15/6436 (EP,US);
D06M15/647 (EP,US);
D06M15/65 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/12] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche, Wasser- und Ölabweisende Zusammensetzung sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2002/26] | English: | Water-soluble, water/oil repellent treating composition and method of making | [2002/26] | French: | Composition hydrosoluble, hydrophobe et oléophobe, procédé pour sa production | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 18.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0353709 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4* page 2, line 51 - page 4, line 46 *; | [A]WO9523830 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 24 *; | [A]US5808125 (STANDKE BURKHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 41 *; | [AD]US5883185 (MATSUMURA KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-4 * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 8 * |