EP1219980 - Method and apparatus for producing color filter, method and apparatus for manufacturing liquid crystal device, method and apparatus for manufacturing EL device, method of discharging material, apparatus for controlling head and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/20] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawase, Tomomi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392-0811 / JP | 02 /
Aruga, Hisashi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392-0811 / JP | 03 /
Katagami, Satoru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392-0811 / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Masaharu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392-0811 / JP | 05 /
Kiguchi, Hiroshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392-0811 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310627.3 | 19.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP20000389320 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000389320 | JP20010329823 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001329823 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1219980 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1219980 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219980 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, G02F1/1335, B41J2/01, H01L51/40, H01L27/00 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
B41J25/003 (EP,US);
G02B5/201 (EP,US);
G02F1/133516 (EP,US);
H01L27/00 (EP,US);
B41J2202/09 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2005/01] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Apparat zur Herstellung eines Farbfilters, eines Flüssigkristallgerätes und eines elektrolumineszierenden Gerätes, Methode und Apparat zur Entladung von Material | [2002/27] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing color filter, method and apparatus for manufacturing liquid crystal device, method and apparatus for manufacturing EL device, method of discharging material, apparatus for controlling head and electronic apparatus | [2002/27] | French: | Procédé et appareil de manufacture d'un filtre coloré, d'un dispositif à cristaux liquides et d'un dispositif électroluminescent, procédé et appareil et de décharge d'un matériau | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000089017 ; | [XY]US6277529 (MARUMOTO YOSHITOMO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-13,25-29,33-36,38 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 54; figures 1-19 * * column 4, line 11 - column 12, line 20 * [Y] 14-18,22-24; | [Y]JP2000323276 ; | [E]EP1208985 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5,9-14,17-38 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0158]; figures 1-17,22,23; claim - *; | [X]EP0829368 (SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US]) [X] 25,28,29,33-35 * column 5, line 14 - column 5, line 48; figures 4-8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000089017 A 20000331 (CANON INC) [X] 1-5,9-13,25-29,33-36,38 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000323276 A 20001124 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 14-18,22-24 * abstract * |