EP1322042 - Convolutional encoding using a modified multiplier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 7839 Churchill Way M/S 3999 Dallas Texas 75251 / US | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS LIMITED 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 7839 Churchill Way, M/S 3999 Dallas Texas 75251 / US | ||
For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS LIMITED 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | |||
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Inc. 7839 Churchill Way, M/S 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Limited 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dent, Peter Richard The Old Hall, 74b High Street Irthlingborough, Northamptonshire NN95Px / GB | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2003/30] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department PO Box 5069 Northampton, NN4 7ZE / GB | ||
Former [2003/26] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Ltd., EPD MS/13, 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310694.3 | 20.12.2001 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322042 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1322042 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/23, G06F7/52 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
G06F7/53 (EP,US);
G06F7/724 (EP,US);
H03M13/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/26] | Title | German: | Faltungskodierer wobei ein geänderter Multiplizierer verwendet wird | [2003/26] | English: | Convolutional encoding using a modified multiplier | [2003/26] | French: | Codeur convolutionnair utilisant un multiplicateur modifié | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2002 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2008 | Decision despatched | 31.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | BE | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | IT | 08.04.2009 | NL | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | ES | 19.07.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | IE | 20.12.2009 | LU | 20.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.12.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 19.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4598382 (SATO TAI [JP]) [DA] 1,7,14 * figure 1 *; | [A] - TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP RADIO ACCESS NETWORK, "3G TS 25.212 V3.3.0", WWW.3GPP.ORG, (200006), XP002202956 [A] 1 * figure 3 * |