EP1219676 - Rubber composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | |||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | |||
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagisawa, Kazuhiro c/o Bridgestone Corp.Tech.C. 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-Cho Kodaira City, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Hajime c/o Bridgestone Corp.Tech.Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-Cho Kodaira City, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Konno, Tomohisa, c/o JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-Chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Udagawa, Yoshiyuki, c/o JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-Chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tadaki, Toshihiro c/o JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-Chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Whalley, Kevin MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310801.4 | 21.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP20000399156 | 27.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000399156 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219676 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219676 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C08L9/06 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L19/006 (EP,US);
C08K3/34, C08L19/006 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/13] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kautschukmischung | [2002/27] | English: | Rubber composition | [2002/27] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63137939 ; | [X]JPH04332701 ; | [X]JPS60108443 ; | [X]EP0661298 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 16, line 1 - line 6; claims 15,18-23 *; | [X]DE19643035 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1-3,5 *; | [X]US5807941 (TSUJI SUGURU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 11 * * column 11, line 1 - line 11 * * example 10; table 9 ** claims 1,2,12,21 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 29, Database accession no. 1988-201283, XP002192232 & JPS63137939 A 19880609 (NITTA KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 01, Database accession no. 1993-004650, XP002192233 & JPH04332701 A 19921119 (SUMITOMO DOW KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 30, Database accession no. 1985-180755, XP002192234 & JPS60108443 A 19850613 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |