EP1134360 - Device for adjusting the diameter of the stator of a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states SNECMA 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states SNECMA MOTEURS 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arilla, Jean-Baptiste 20 avenue de la Libération 91450 Soisy sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Arraitz, Anne-Marie 90 Promenade du Bourg 77176 Nandy / FR | 03 /
Gendraud, Alain Dominique 5 rue des Tilleuls 77670 Vernou La Celle sur Seine / FR | [2001/38] | Application number, filing date | 01400059.0 | 11.01.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | FR20000000371 | 13.01.2000 Original published format: FR 0000371 | [2001/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134360 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134360 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134360 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/24, F01D25/24 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
F01D11/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/38] | F01D11/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/17] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verstellvorrichtung für den Durchmesser des Stators eines Gasturbinenwerks | [2001/38] | English: | Device for adjusting the diameter of the stator of a gas turbine engine | [2001/38] | French: | Agencement de réglage de diamètre d'un stator de turbine à gaz | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 14.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4573866 (SANDY JR JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4177004 (BOBO MELVIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]FR1604778 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CO.) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9412775 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 5,6 * figures 1,7A,7B, * |